LA SB518 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date 5/23/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the collection of proceeds of fees from the University Neighborhood Security and Improvement District. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for the collection of proceeds of fees from the University Neighborhood Security and Improvement District. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#995) (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#436) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#436) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Effective date 5/23/2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 420. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |