LA SB505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a temporary restraining order upon application by a peace officer under certain circumstances. (8/1/20)
Title
Provides for a temporary restraining order upon application by a peace officer under certain circumstances. (8/1/20)
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 505 CONCUR (#625) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 505 FINAL PASSAGE (#514) (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 505 FINAL PASSAGE (#212) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 505 FINAL PASSAGE (#514) (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 505 FINAL PASSAGE (#212) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2020. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 246. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |