LA SB427 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date 7/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers the responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Atchafalaya Basin Program from within the Department of Natural Resources to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. (7/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Transfers the responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Atchafalaya Basin Program from within the Department of Natural Resources to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority. (7/1/18) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 427 CONCUR (#1344) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 427 FINAL PASSAGE (#1274) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 427 FINAL PASSAGE (#372) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 427 FINAL PASSAGE (#1274) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 427 FINAL PASSAGE (#372) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2018. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 570. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-18 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |