LA SB300 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Charitable Raffles, Bingo, and Keno Licensing Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Charitable Raffles, Bingo, and Keno Licensing Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 300 ADOPT (#722) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 300 MOTION TO ADOPT (#768) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 300 REJECT (#637) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 300 FINAL PASSAGE (#589) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 300 FINAL PASSAGE (#266) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-01SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-01HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-01SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-05-31HouseHouse conferees appointed: Jones, James, and Miguez.
2020-05-31HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-05-31SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Jackson, Johns, and Smith.
2020-05-31HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2020-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-29SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-29HouseCalled from the calendar.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseRules suspended.
2020-05-27HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-05-27HouseReported with amendments (10-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-19SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=SB300&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162435
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174051
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174683
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178973
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174028
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174613
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176335
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176214
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177593
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1162439
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174254
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174824
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176334
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178756
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178870
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174645
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177472
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178327
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178900
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178917

Bill Comments

feedback