LA SB3 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes permanent reductions to certain tax incentive rebate programs. (Item # 3)(gov sig) (EG +$11,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes permanent reductions to certain tax incentive rebate programs. (Item # 3)(gov sig) (EG +$11,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-02-26SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-02-25SenateReported favorably.
2018-02-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2018-02-16SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback