LA SB291 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board to access certain criminal history record information of applicants. (8/1/22)
Title
Authorizes the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board to access certain criminal history record information of applicants. (8/1/22)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 291 FINAL PASSAGE (#301) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |