LA SB242 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to provide for consideration of certain matters during regular sessions in even-numbered years. (2/3 - CA3s2(A))
Title
Constitutional amendment to provide for consideration of certain matters during regular sessions in even-numbered years. (2/3 - CA3s2(A))
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |