LA SB207 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 8/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to civil service for cities with over 100,000 in population and certain municipalities governed by municipal fire and police civil service system. (8/1/13)
Title
Provides relative to civil service for cities with over 100,000 in population and certain municipalities governed by municipal fire and police civil service system. (8/1/13)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207 CONCUR (#816) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#707) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#707) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 207 FINAL PASSAGE (#327) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2013. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 362. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |