LA SB202 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Effective date 5/31/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Nurse Licensure Compact. (gov sig) (EG2 INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Nurse Licensure Compact. (gov sig) (EG2 INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 202 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1339) (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 ADOPT (#1309) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 REJECT (#1182) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#1080) (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateEffective date 5/31/2018.
2018-05-31SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 577.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-17HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2018-05-17HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2018-05-16HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2018-05-16HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dustin Miller, Hoffmann, and Carmody.
2018-05-16HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2018-05-16SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Peterson, and Mills.
2018-05-16HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2018-05-16SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 25 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-15SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 20. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-03HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-02HouseReported with amendments (7-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-26HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-25HouseReported with amendments (8-3). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-05HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-04HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-04SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-21SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB202&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070414
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077624
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099008
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102938
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089199
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1089932
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092174
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092504
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097043
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097356
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1070417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076905
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078108
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078677
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090079
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092516
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098064
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101929
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1104232
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083118
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097561
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098819
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098972

Bill Comments

feedback