LA SB202 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date 6/17/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revises core curriculum requirements and the method of calculating the grade point average for TOPS awards. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises core curriculum requirements and the method of calculating the grade point average for TOPS awards. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 202 MOTION TO ADOPT (#888) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 ADOPT (#975) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 REJECT (#610) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#547) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17SenateEffective date 6/17/2013.
2013-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 359.
2013-06-06SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2013-06-05HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2013-06-05SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2013-06-04SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2013-06-04HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2013-06-04HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2013-06-04SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2013-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
2013-06-03SenateConference committee report received.
2013-06-03HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2013-05-30SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2013-05-30HouseHouse conferees appointed: Hensgens, Carter, and Nancy Landry.
2013-05-29HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2013-05-29SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Appel, and Walsworth.
2013-05-28HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2013-05-27SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
2013-05-23SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2013-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2013-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013.
2013-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013.
2013-05-10HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2013-05-09HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2013-05-08HouseReported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2013-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2013-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2013-04-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2013-04-22SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2013-04-22SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2013-04-16SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2013-04-15SenateReported with amendments.
2013-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
2013-03-29SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=13rs&b=SB202&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835474
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837124
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840984
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=855556
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857653
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=837083
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840277
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839724
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838874
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846253
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845788
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846867
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846916
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=849285
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851169
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851701
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=835476
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=836957
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=838813
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=839091
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=841149
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=845729
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=846411
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=854648
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=857409
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=856146
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=840950
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=850347
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=851272
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=855252
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=855492

Bill Comments

feedback