LA SB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates special funds for the deposit of certain federal monies in the state treasury. (gov sig) (EN +$811,178,704 SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates special funds for the deposit of certain federal monies in the state treasury. (gov sig) (EN +$811,178,704 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 189 MOTION TO ADOPT (#807) (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 189 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#806) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 189 3 MINUTE RULE (#805) (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 ADOPT (#756) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 REJECT (#609) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 AMENDMENT # 2773 BY WHEAT (#541) (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 AMENDMENT # 2773 BY WHEAT (#541) (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 189 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#806) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 189 3 MINUTE RULE (#805) (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 ADOPT (#756) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 REJECT (#609) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 AMENDMENT # 2773 BY WHEAT (#541) (Y: 44 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#542) (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Vote on SB 189 AMENDMENT # 2773 BY WHEAT (#541) (Y: 43 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#270) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2020. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 62, nays 39. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 10 nays. |
2020-06-01 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2020-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2020-05-29 | House | House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Gary Carter. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: White, Cortez, and Tarver. |
2020-05-29 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-28 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 25. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-28 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/20. |
2020-05-26 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 11 for 05/28/20. |
2020-05-26 | House | Notice given. |
2020-05-26 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 11 for 05/26/20. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-22 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 11 for 05/26/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Reported with amendments (13-9). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |