LA SB159 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the detention of seventeen year old juveniles under certain circumstances. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Provides for the detention of seventeen year old juveniles under certain circumstances. (gov sig) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 159 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1231) (Y: 70 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 159 SUSPEND THE RULES (#1228) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 ADOPT (#1024) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 SUSPEND THE RULES (#1023) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 ADOPT (#1018) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 REJECT (#940) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#1001) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on SB 159 SUSPEND THE RULES (#1228) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 ADOPT (#1024) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 SUSPEND THE RULES (#1023) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 ADOPT (#1018) (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 REJECT (#940) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Vote on SB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#1001) (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 159 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Veto message from the Governor received and read. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 34. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | By a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Seabaugh, Marino, and LaCombe. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cathey, Talbot, and Smith. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-06-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023. |
2023-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-05-31 | House | Reported favorably (9-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2023-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |