LA SB156 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for access to criminal history information in civil cases of domestic abuse, dating violence, human trafficking, and sexual assault. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for access to criminal history information in civil cases of domestic abuse, dating violence, human trafficking, and sexual assault. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 156 CONCUR (#666) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#719) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 156 FINAL PASSAGE (#240) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateEffective date 6/11/2019.
2019-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 259.
2019-06-04SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-31SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2019-05-30SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2019-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-30HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-30HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19.
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-21HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-20HouseReported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2019-05-07HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-06SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-30SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB156&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120963
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129011
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131531
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140575
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144057
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128971
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129431
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130201
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135529
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135433
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135416
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135963
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136701
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140052
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1120964
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1123809
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130141
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130247
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131662
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130224
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135292
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135536
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137297
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140079
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143855
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1131465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139761
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140460

Bill Comments

feedback