LA SB130 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to fuel sale requirements at qualified truck stops. (8/1/14)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to fuel sale requirements at qualified truck stops. (8/1/14)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#182) (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2014-03-31SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2014-03-31SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 18 nays.
2014-03-26SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-03-25SenateReported with amendments.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2014-02-25SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback