LA SB129 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Effective date 6/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to foster care children in high school. (gov sig) (EN +$961,264 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to foster care children in high school. (gov sig) (EN +$961,264 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 CONCUR (#1335) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#1264) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 129 FINAL PASSAGE (#368) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01SenateEffective date 6/1/2018.
2018-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 649.
2018-05-18SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-17SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-17HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-16HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2018-05-16HouseReported with amendments (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-04-26HouseReported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-04-11HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2018-04-11SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-10SenateRead by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-09SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-03-22SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2018-03-21SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2018-03-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-02-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SB129&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068686
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077636
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084340
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099287
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103639
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084216
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090458
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090644
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090518
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097798
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1068688
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076235
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078620
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085037
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085408
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090641
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098084
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100774
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101710
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085517
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098501
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099171

Bill Comments

feedback