LA SB117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-04 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits alcoholic beverage licensees from accepting nutritional assistance benefits as payment for alcohol and tobacco products. (8/1/12)
Title
Prohibits alcoholic beverage licensees from accepting nutritional assistance benefits as payment for alcohol and tobacco products. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#561) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 117, FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-05-04 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 28. | |
2012-05-02 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-04-30 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-05 | Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-03-28 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-27 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-21 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-02-22 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |