LA HR94 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to a study regarding registrars of voters
Title
Provides relative to a study regarding registrars of voters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - House Vote on HR 94 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#626) (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-02 | House | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 67, nays 21. The resolution was adopted. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2015-05-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2015-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |