LA HR80 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-22 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an earlier prefiling deadline for legislation related to retirement
Title
Provides an earlier prefiling deadline for legislation related to retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HR 80, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#861) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-06-13 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-06-13 | Rules suspended. | |
2011-06-13 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |