LA HR71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DOTD to study the adoption of special signage to designate streets and highways in honor of military personnel
Title
Requests DOTD to study the adoption of special signage to designate streets and highways in honor of military personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read by title, adopted. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2014-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-04-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |