LA HCR84 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends James C. "Jim" Beam for providing journalistic coverage of the Louisiana Legislature for fifty years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends James C. "Jim" Beam for providing journalistic coverage of the Louisiana Legislature for fifty years

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Danahay [D]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]
Rep. John Anders [D]Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]
Rep. John Bagneris [D]Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]
Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. George Cromer [R]
Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jeff Hall [D]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Kenneth Havard [R]Rep. Lowell Hazel [R]Rep. Cameron Henry [R]
Rep. Bob Hensgens [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Marcus Hunter [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]
Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]
Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]Rep. Terry Landry [D]
Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]
Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Helena Moreno [D]Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]
Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]
Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Eugene Reynolds [D]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]
Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Robert Shadoin [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]
Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]
Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Major Thibaut [D]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]Sen. Dan Morrish [R]
Sen. John Smith [R]

Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 84 ADOPT (#733) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-07SenateRead by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
2018-05-03SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-05-02HouseRead by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback