LA HCR67 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Title
Provides relative to the Government Pension Offset and Windfall Elimination Provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 67 CO-AUTHORS (#393) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 67 CONCUR (#392) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#419) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#419) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 67 CONCUR (#392) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#419) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#419) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023. |
2023-05-04 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2023-05-01 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |