LA HCR23 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commend Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center at Shreveport for its extraordinary response to the COVID-19 pandemic
Title
Commend Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center at Shreveport for its extraordinary response to the COVID-19 pandemic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 23 ADOPT (#69) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-24 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-23 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2020-06-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |