LA HCR180 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study and make recommendations concerning the use of body cameras by law enforcement agencies in this state
Title
Creates a task force to study and make recommendations concerning the use of body cameras by law enforcement agencies in this state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1125) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 180 ADOPT (#1119) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#909) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 AMENDMENT # 4553 BY MORENO MOTION TO ADOPT (#908) (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 180 ADOPT (#1119) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#909) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 AMENDMENT # 4553 BY MORENO MOTION TO ADOPT (#908) (Y: 22 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-06-11 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 86, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-08 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-08 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2015-05-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |