LA HCR103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests state-level collaboration on cancer investigation and local public health notifications regarding cancer incidence
Title
Requests state-level collaboration on cancer investigation and local public health notifications regarding cancer incidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HCR 103 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#864) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 103 ADOPT (#772) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 103 ADOPT (#772) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |