LA HB859 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the appointment and removal of employees of the municipal fire and police civil service
Title
Provides relative to the appointment and removal of employees of the municipal fire and police civil service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 859 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1322) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 859 ADOPT (#1334) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 859 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1185) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 859 HB 859 BY MONTOUCET (#1034) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 859 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 859 ADOPT (#1334) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 859 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1185) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 859 HB 859 BY MONTOUCET (#1034) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 859 FINAL PASSAGE (#142) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 552. |
2016-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2016-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2016-06-03 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2016-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Colomb, Ward, and Appel. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2016-06-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Montoucet, Berthelot, and Adams. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016. |
2016-03-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported favorably (13-2). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |