LA HB858 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Becomes HB 973.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Becomes HB 973.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the limitation of liability for recreational landowners
Title
Provides relative to the limitation of liability for recreational landowners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Becomes HB 973. |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported by substitute (11-0-1). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |