LA HB838 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 200.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fees charged by the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board (EN +$36,250 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to fees charged by the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers Board (EN +$36,250 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 838 FINAL PASSAGE (#882) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 838 FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House Vote on HB 838 FINAL PASSAGE (#521) (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 200. |
2014-05-22 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-14 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 71, nays 15. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/22/2014. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-14 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |