LA HB797 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 1:00 pm in Room E
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a hospital service district from using "construction management at risk" for projects estimated to cost less than two million dollars (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Title
Prohibits a hospital service district from using "construction management at risk" for projects estimated to cost less than two million dollars (EG NO IMPACT See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 797 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 797 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 797 FINAL PASSAGE (#600) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |