LA HB758 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Board of Ethics to make available the name of a complainant under certain circumstances (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the Board of Ethics to make available the name of a complainant under certain circumstances (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 758, FINAL PASSAGE (#1218) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 758, FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 758, FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-09 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-09 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-01 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-27 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-26 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-29 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-28 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 28, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-20 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-17 | Prefiled. |