LA HB724 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to deposits payable upon the depositor's death
Title
Provides relative to deposits payable upon the depositor's death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#519) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 724 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 64. |
2016-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2016. |
2016-03-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |