LA HB64 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-06 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-06 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the extent of the state sales and use tax exemption for business utilities (Items #9 and 36) (EG +$238,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the extent of the state sales and use tax exemption for business utilities (Items #9 and 36) (EG +$238,200,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-06 - House - House Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#93) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 49, nays 49. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2016-03-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/06/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-04 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/04/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-03 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/03/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-02 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/02/2016. |
2016-03-01 | House | Notice given. |
2016-03-01 | House | Notice removed |
2016-03-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-03-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/01/2016. |
2016-02-29 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-29 | House | Notice removed |
2016-02-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-02-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/29/2016. |
2016-02-26 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-26 | House | Notice removed |
2016-02-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/26/2016. |
2016-02-25 | House | Notice given. |
2016-02-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/25/2016. |
2016-02-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Rules suspended. |
2016-02-23 | House | Reported unfavorably (18-0). |
2016-02-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |