LA HB593 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the La. Real Estate Commission to conduct criminal background checks
Title
Authorizes the La. Real Estate Commission to conduct criminal background checks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2010-04-13 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-04-12 | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |