LA HB513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to bicycle and pedestrian traffic on roadways
Title
Provides relative to bicycle and pedestrian traffic on roadways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 513, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 513, FINAL PASSAGE (#740) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 513, FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2011-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 513, FINAL PASSAGE (#740) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 513, FINAL PASSAGE (#259) (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-27 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 244. | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-22 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-19 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-14 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-14 | Rules suspended | |
2011-06-13 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-25 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2011-05-24 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2011. | |
2011-05-18 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably (12-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-04-15 | Prefiled. |