LA HB510 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Louisiana Checkbook website to provide transparency of state fiscal information (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes the Louisiana Checkbook website to provide transparency of state fiscal information (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 510 FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 510 AMENDMENT # 3775 BY JOHNSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#640) (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 510 AMENDMENT # 3775 BY JOHNSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#640) (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |