LA HB509 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requires presentations at public meetings relative to plans for schools in need of academic improvement (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires presentations at public meetings relative to plans for schools in need of academic improvement (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 509 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1218) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 509 FINAL PASSAGE (#980) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 509 AMENDMENT # 4062 BY MORRISH HB 509 BY CARTER G. (#979) (Y: 14 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 509 FINAL PASSAGE (#265) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-28HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 555.
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-17HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-16HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
2018-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-10SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-09SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-08SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-07SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-04-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-04HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18.
2018-03-29HouseNotice given.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/29/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB509&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072365
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077755
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083245
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098587
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102763
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077031
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077662
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078806
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078815
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080654
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082862
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083201
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093112
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095204
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095205
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095232
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096938
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098269
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1072383
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1076234
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077919
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080566
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083285
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092378
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083210
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095234

Bill Comments

feedback