LA HB497 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the disposal or sale of projects funded through the capital outlay budget under certain circumstances (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the disposal or sale of projects funded through the capital outlay budget under certain circumstances (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 497 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1052) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 497 FINAL PASSAGE (#770) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 497 FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2019-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-06SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-06HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-06HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-06-06HouseRules suspended.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-29SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-28SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-27SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-14HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-13HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB497&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122097
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133663
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143577
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133644
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133262
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137696
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138711
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141498
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143575
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122163
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130797
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133683
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135189
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137840
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1143705
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145059
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136822
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140997

Bill Comments

feedback