LA HB431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to DNA database cross-referencing
Title
Provides relative to DNA database cross-referencing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#1201) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Vote on HB 431 FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 63 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 625. |
2022-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-12 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported with amendments (6-4). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |