LA HB353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for vaccine requirements in the workplace
Title
Provides for vaccine requirements in the workplace
Sponsors
Rep. Troy Romero [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 353 FINAL PASSAGE (#1256) (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 353 AMENDMENT # 5155 BY EDMONSTON MOTION TO ADOPT (#1255) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 353 AMENDMENT # 5155 BY EDMONSTON MOTION TO ADOPT (#1255) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 37. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |