LA HB345 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for changes to the Additional Default Remedies Act
Title
Provides for changes to the Additional Default Remedies Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 345, FINAL PASSAGE (#1467) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 345, FINAL PASSAGE (#274) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 345, FINAL PASSAGE (#274) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 519. | |
2010-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-08 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-13 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |