LA HB338 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission
Title
Provides relative to the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 338 FINAL PASSAGE (#429) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 338 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 338 FINAL PASSAGE (#125) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2023-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 83. |
2023-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023. |
2023-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |