LA HB335 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the North Lake Charles Economic Development District and provides relative to the Southside Economic Development District of the City of Monroe
Title
Creates the North Lake Charles Economic Development District and provides relative to the Southside Economic Development District of the City of Monroe
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 335 ADOPT (#994) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 335 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1189) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 335 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1074) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#847) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 335 AMENDMENT # 3357 BY EDMONDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#568) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 335 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1189) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 335 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1074) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#847) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 335 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 335 AMENDMENT # 3357 BY EDMONDS MOTION TO ADOPT (#568) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-13 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 306. |
2023-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2023. |
2023-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Wilford Carter, Edmonds, and Fisher. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Bouie, Stine, and Jackson. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023. |
2023-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2023-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |