LA HB256 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-29 - Effective date: August 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain interlocal risk management agencies
Title
Provides relative to certain interlocal risk management agencies
Sponsors
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 256 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#730) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#567) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 256 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-29 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2015. |
2015-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 309. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015. |
2015-05-27 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/4/2015. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |