LA HB253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain building code roofing inspections of a commercial or residential structure
Title
Provides relative to certain building code roofing inspections of a commercial or residential structure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-29 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2023-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2023-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |