LA HB251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Recreates the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreates the Early Childhood Care and Education Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 251 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#649) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 251 FINAL PASSAGE (#362) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 251 HB 251 BY HILFERTY (#72) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: See Act.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 180.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-27HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-26SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-21SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-18SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-07HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-26HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-02-26HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB251&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159974
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169595
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173298
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178334
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181913
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1164807
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169552
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1170175
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175805
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176752
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178237
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1159990
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1169822
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173318
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176140

Bill Comments

feedback