LA HB235 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-03 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Local & Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide, by local law, for the incorporation of any area located within a single parish (RR INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Authorizes the legislature to provide, by local law, for the incorporation of any area located within a single parish (RR INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#654) (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 79, nays 15. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-01 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0-1). |
2015-05-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2015-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |