LA HB213 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Medicaid eligibility determination functions and Medicaid fraud detection and prevention (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for Medicaid eligibility determination functions and Medicaid fraud detection and prevention (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-5). |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (8-5). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |