LA HB213 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the transfer of surplus monies in the Fourth JDC (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the transfer of surplus monies in the Fourth JDC (EN NO IMPACT LF See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Charles Chaney [R] | Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R] | Rep. Marcus Hunter [D] |
Sen. John Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 213 FINAL PASSAGE (#759) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 213 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Vote on HB 213 FINAL PASSAGE (#107) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 268. |
2018-05-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/18. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |