LA HB212 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Effective date: June 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Effective date: June 7, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the creation of a statewide mapping and planning system for certain schools
Title
Provides relative to the creation of a statewide mapping and planning system for certain schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#526) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#165) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 212 FINAL PASSAGE (#165) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | House | Effective date: June 7, 2013. |
2013-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 136. |
2013-05-30 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |