LA HB2 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Effective date: 06/26/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget (Item #7)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget (Item #7)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#22) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#29) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#4) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseEffective date: 06/26/2020.
2020-06-26HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
2020-06-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-11HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2020-06-10HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/11/20.
2020-06-10HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-10SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-09SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-09SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-09SenateRead by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee amendments read and adopted.
2020-06-09SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-04SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-04HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/04/20.
2020-06-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-02HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-02HouseReported with amendments (17-0).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB2&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179118
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179223
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179701
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181685
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184847
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179202
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179217
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179524
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179397
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180365
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180407
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180845
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180814
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181172
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181077
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181288
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181673
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179119
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179289
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179851
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180541
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181105
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181075
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181301

Bill Comments

feedback