LA HB189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Effective date: 01/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for processes, including public comment, to identify agency rules that may be contrary to law, outdated, unnecessary, overly complex, or burdensome (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for processes, including public comment, to identify agency rules that may be contrary to law, outdated, unnecessary, overly complex, or burdensome (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 189 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1134) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 189 AMENDMENT # 3838 BY DONAHUE HB 189 BY WRIGHT (#942) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 189 AMENDMENT # 3838 BY DONAHUE HB 189 BY WRIGHT (#942) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 189 FINAL PASSAGE (#341) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2019. |
2018-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 454. |
2018-05-17 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-03-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |